skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/07/20 11:02:42 AM

Tang, Alexander Wing Leung

CPSO#: 29274

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alexander Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang ( CPSO# 29274 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6002

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5R 1N5

Business Address:
The Cumberland Clinic
The Renaissance Court
162 Cumberland Street
Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5

Business Address:
Rice Cosmetic Surgery
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital 4001 Leslie St Willowdale, ON M2K 1E1
Date Received: 04 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020