skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/11/19 13:31:40 PM

Mah, Jung Yuey

CPSO#: 28785

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1977
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
674 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z6
Phone: (905) 575-3600
Fax: (905) 575-1779 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Y. Mah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mah ( CPSO# 28785 )

Business Address:
674 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z6
Phone Number: (905) 575-3600

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Center
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUNG YUEY MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1977

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)