skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/11/19 13:30:23 PM

Gapski, John Andrew

CPSO#: 28156

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 13 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Gapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 2004 Stavebank Rd Mississauga ON L5C 1T2
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2019