THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:24:18 PM
Niamatali, Gordon Ramzan
CPSO#:
27969
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
30 Oct 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Apr 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:11 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Oct 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 22 Oct 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1996 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 30 Oct 1997 |