THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:08:24 PM
Hutchison, Rosemary Patricia
CPSO#:
27947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
905-21 Dale Ave
Toronto ON M4W 1K3
Phone: 647-342-9360
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY PATRICIA HUTCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHISON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Feb 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1982 |