skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/12/19 13:21:57 PM

Pairaudeau, Nicholas Vivian John

CPSO#: 27748

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1975
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 402
Willowdale ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 226-1661
Fax: (416) 222-2538 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

701,Sheppard Ave East,
North York,
Suite 310
North York ON  M2K2W1
Canada
Phone: 416 226 1661
Fax: 4162222538
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicholas Pairaudeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pairaudeau ( CPSO# 27748 )

Business Address:
402 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 226-1661


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS VIVIAN JOHN PAIRAUDEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIRAUDEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1975

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)