skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/07/20 4:12:06 AM

Slyfield, David Gore Mccrumine

CPSO#: 26724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HRRH Professional Building
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 311
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 746-3035 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Slyfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Slyfield ( CPSO# 26724 )

Business Address:
York Finch Medical Centre
Suite 311
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 746-3035

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID GORE MCCRUMINE SLYFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLYFIELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2020

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)