THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:59:56 AM
Woods, Donald Barry
CPSO#:
26513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 124
2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1M2
Phone: (705) 549-8270
Fax: (705) 549-8554
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Donald Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD BARRY WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2019 |