skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 12:57:27 PM

Northan, Allan Albert

CPSO#: 26369

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014