skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/11/19 15:39:37 PM

Tanner, Wayne Royden

CPSO#: 26131

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WAYNE ROYDEN TANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1989