THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:44:03 AM
Lange-Mechlen, Ilse
CPSO#:
25721
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Latvian
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 06 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2019 |