skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/11/19 13:30:44 PM

Fralick, Richard Arthur

CPSO#: 25719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Dec 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804176
Fax: (416) 480-6002 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD ARTHUR FRALICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRALICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1982