THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:27:40 PM
Colman, Jack Marc
CPSO#:
25491
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Mar 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room 5N-526/ACHD Program
PMCC/Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-340-3338
Fax: 416-340-4127
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACK MARC COLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1973 |