skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/11/19 14:27:39 PM

El-Sawy, Reda Mohamed

CPSO#: 25301

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Filebank Record Centre Ltd., 488 Carlingview Drive, Etobicoke, ON M9W 6M8
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015