skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/11/19 14:11:47 PM

Keeley, Paul Joseph

CPSO#: 25082

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Keeley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 24 Nov 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016