skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 13:06:10 PM

Clarke, Margaret Elizabeth

CPSO#: 24835

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 30-Jul-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 22 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2002