THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:33:51 PM
Maloney, Justin Patrick
CPSO#:
24706
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-May-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 02 May 2022 |