skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/11/19 14:30:40 PM

Halliday, Frederick

CPSO#: 24364

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 19 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frederick Halliday Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital 5546 Portage Road Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Date Received: 19 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2016