THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:05:37 AM
Fitzsimmons, Phyllis Eileen
CPSO#:
24045
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Aug 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For those patients who intend to continue on with Dr. Mingo and have seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the records will be moved to:
Suite 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto, ON
M4X 1W4
For those patients who have not seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the Records will be stored at:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Jul 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |