THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:50:17 AM
Miller, James Lance
CPSO#:
23598
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
1st Floor
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-3881
Fax: (613) 432-8649
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES LANCE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Nov 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Nov 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1974 |