skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 13:07:35 PM

Amato, Dominick Joseph

CPSO#: 23443

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Program for Gaucher Disease
60 Murray Street
Room L3-415
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5189
Fax: (416) 586-4677 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOMINICK JOSEPH AMATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMATO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1977