THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:08:25 PM
Blajchman, Morris Aaron
CPSO#:
23405
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 12 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:17 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |