THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:28:48 PM
Mehta, Jagdishchandra Amratlal
CPSO#:
23399
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Feb 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
3-Jun-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of Bombay, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Dec 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |