THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:50:02 PM
Springle, Milan Anthony
CPSO#:
23260
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.A. Springle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Oct 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2021 |