skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/11/19 15:30:16 PM

McCall, John Gerald

CPSO#: 23070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone: (705) 445-5141
Fax: (705) 445-9419 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN GERALD MCCALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1970 to 31 Dec 1970
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1970