skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 13:31:20 PM

Lee-Sing, Richard Allan

CPSO#: 22107

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 16-May-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 Jan 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017