THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:29:58 PM
Jamieson, William George
CPSO#:
21137
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Dec 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Dec 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1960 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1998 |