skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 12:55:28 PM

McLean, Juanita Arline Gallaugher

CPSO#: 21112

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre - Medical Records Department.
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013