skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/09/20 21:03:02 PM

Forbath, Peter Gyorgy

CPSO#: 17077

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:10 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter G. Forbath to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2018:

Dr. Forbath has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.