skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/02/20 2:44:29 AM

Middlemiss, Kenneth Chisholm Hamilton

CPSO#: 14665

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 5-Sep-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1954
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2012