THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:09:28 AM
Wyllie, John Clifton
CPSO#:
13879
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1957 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:01 Jan 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1952 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Dec 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1961 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 1984 |