skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/11/19 14:54:24 PM

Bruckschwaiger, Vanessa Rose

CPSO#: 107180

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of General Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christian Bruckschwaiger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bruckschwaiger ( CPSO# 28072 )
Dr. M. Bruckschwaiger ( CPSO# 30631 )
Dr. V. Bruckschwaiger ( CPSO# 107180)

Business Address:
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone Number: (519) 659-1122

Business Address:
209 - 460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 659-2002

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANESSA ROSE BRUCKSCHWAIGER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BRUCKSCHWAIGER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BRUCKSCHWAIGER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BRUCKSCHWAIGER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BRUCKSCHWAIGER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BRUCKSCHWAIGER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BRUCKSCHWAIGER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020