THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:29:37 PM
Kurtz, Veronika
CPSO#:
99520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
444 Douro St Suite 201
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 271-7172
Fax: (519) 271-3124
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VERONIKA KURTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURTZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |