THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:33:38 PM
Martin, Nicholas Robert
CPSO#:
96882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeview FHT
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON K8V 6N8
Phone: (613) 394-0770
Fax: (613) 480-6588
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ROBERT MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2014 |