THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:53:38 AM
Sarco, Jean Pierre
CPSO#:
96747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103-175 Chancellors Way
Chancellors Way Medical Arts Centre
Guelph ON N1G 5K1
Phone: (519) 830-9750
Fax: (519) 821-5151
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:04 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEAN PIERRE SARCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARCO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 23 Nov 2011
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 24 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 05 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2016 |