THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:25:52 PM
Mastouri, Negin
CPSO#:
96679
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1709 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6P 4E5
Phone: 4165363750
Fax: 6474806311
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEGIN MASTOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTOURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 20 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2014 |