THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:01:55 AM
Ferreira, Alexander Mina
CPSO#:
96189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bancroft Family Health Team
16 Billa Street
Bancroft ON K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-1565
Fax: (613) 332-0526
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Aug 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER MINA FERREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2013 |