THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:06:36 PM
Siu, Kaitlyn Victoria
CPSO#:
95384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Turnbull, Kaitlyn Victoria (used until: 08 Nov 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thorold Family Health Centre
21 Front Street S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Phone: (905) 688-6440
Fax: 905 687 1855
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAITLYN VICTORIA SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |