THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:44:17 PM
Hall, Alison Jacintha
CPSO#:
94217
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
815 College Street
Suite 206
Toronto ON M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 923-5500
Fax: (416) 923-2249
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Alison Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jul 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISON JACINTHA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2010 to 10 Oct 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2011 to 18 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2012 |