THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:07:43 PM
Clayden, Wesley Curtis
CPSO#:
93812
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mosley Medical
Unit 3
940 Mosley St
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 2G9
Phone: (705) 429-4801
Fax: (705) 429-9257
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Sports Medicine Specialists
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto, ON M4P 1E8
Date Received: 27 May 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WESLEY CURTIS CLAYDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAYDEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2016 |