THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:07:22 PM
Davie, Wendy Hoa Ai
CPSO#:
93415
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Beaches Family Practice
Shop 7, 2 Cottesloe Drive
Kewarra Beach 4879
Australia
Phone: 07 4032 7500
Fax: 07 4032 7570
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Patients seeking a copy of their medical records should contact: Bayside Medical Centre, 3 Beck Boulevard, Penetanguishene, ON, L9M 1B9, Tel: 705-549-3939
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WENDY HOA AI DAVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |