THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:46:27 AM
Mankad, Deepali Bhartendu
CPSO#:
93183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Mumbai, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
B07 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: 416-438-2911 Ext. 6120
Fax: 416 292 9678
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. Deepali Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Mar 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Developmental Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2023 |
|
Active |