THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 6:02:39 AM
Pararajasingam, Thevaki
CPSO#:
93034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304-6633 Highway 7 E
My Wellness Medical Centre
Markham ON L3P 7P2
Phone: 905-554-4500
Fax: 905-554-4700
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
|
Active |