THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:50:22 PM
Poon, Alan Hing-Lun
CPSO#:
92309
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 20-22
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Y7
Phone: 905-881-0360
Fax: 905-881-3601
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:15 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN HING-LUN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |