THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:41:45 PM
Wadhwa, Mandeep
CPSO#:
92171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Delhi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4515 Ebenezer Rd
Brampton ON L6P 2K7
Phone: 9059137222
Fax: 9059130090
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANDEEP WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2011 |