THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:07:58 AM
Fernando, M Nilanga G
CPSO#:
91957
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
476 Peel Street
Floor 3 - Dr. Office
Woodstock ON N4S 1K1
Phone: (519) 2908400
Fax: 226-401-4491
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. M NILANGA G FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 15 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 16 Sep 2010 to 15 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 16 Sep 2011 to 15 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 16 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Sep 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2018 |