THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:50:51 AM
Jerzak, Katarzyna Joanna
CPSO#:
90592
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Jerzak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATARZYNA JOANNA JERZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JERZAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |