THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:55:15 AM
Graff Guerrero, Ariel
CPSO#:
90401
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Michoacan Univ of San Nicolas de Hidalgo, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
GPD and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto ON M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34834
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 Dec 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
|
Active |