THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:40:32 AM
Szeto, Christopher Chung Tek
CPSO#:
89954
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
203-128 Pine St
Sudbury ON P3C 1X3
Phone: W
Fax: 7052226447
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHUNG TEK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Oct 2008 to 02 Nov 2008
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2010 |