THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:08:52 AM
Silver, Janine Ashley
CPSO#:
89108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
13291 Yonge Street, Suite 100
Richmond Hill, On
L4E 4L6
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905)773-7759
Fax: (905)773-1325
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:04 Jan 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANINE ASHLEY SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2014 |